OK HB1638 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; enacting the Oklahoma Agritourism Activities Liability Limitations Act; emergency.
Title
Agriculture; enacting the Oklahoma Agritourism Activities Liability Limitations Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Approved by Governor 04/12/2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2013-04-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Hickman |
2013-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18 |
2013-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-28 | House | General Order |
2013-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 5 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |