OK HB1629 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1629
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; voter registration; modifying conditions for voter eligibility; effective date.
Title
Elections; voter registration; modifying conditions for voter eligibility; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Deck |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 10 |
2023-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Young (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-23 | House | General Order |
2023-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Goodwin |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1629 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary