OK HB1628 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1628
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; eliminating certain point system; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; eliminating certain point system; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin (David) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1628 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)