OK HB1627 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1627
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Remove Representative Burns as principal House author and substitute with Representative Mize
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Remove Representative Burns as principal House author and substitute with Representative Mize
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer protection; Online Marketplace Consumer Protection Act; Attorney General; effective date.
Title
Consumer protection; Online Marketplace Consumer Protection Act; Attorney General; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Remove Representative Burns as principal House author and substitute with Representative Mize |
2022-03-02 | House | Remove Representative Mize as principal House author and substitute with Representative Burns |
2021-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Technology Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Technology |
2021-02-04 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Mize |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1627 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)