OK HB1607 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1607
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Vetoed 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Vetoed 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; child passenger restraint systems; physically disabled parents.
Title
Motor vehicles; child passenger restraint systems; physically disabled parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Vetoed 05/16/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-10 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 11 |
2017-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 5 |
2017-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1607 (Carry Over) 2017-05-16 - Vetoed 05/16/2017