OK HB1604 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; relating to school dropouts; requiring certain information to be made available to certain agencies.
Title
Schools; relating to school dropouts; requiring certain information to be made available to certain agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Died in conference |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Quinn, Ford, Halligan, Smalley, Stanislawski, Sparks, Garrison |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Sherrer |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |