OK HB1601 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1601
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; including feral swine in wildlife damage management; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; including feral swine in wildlife damage management; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Larry Boggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1601 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017