OK HB1564 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1564
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; requirements for candidate filing petitions and fees; effective date.
Title
Elections; requirements for candidate filing petitions and fees; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Died in conference |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Dahm, Fields, Sykes, Simpson, Thompson, Dossett, Bass |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics |
2017-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1564 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 20 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |