OK HB1559 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; modifying scope of marijuana definition; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; modifying scope of marijuana definition; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17HouseApproved by Governor 04/17/2017
2017-04-11HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-11SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-11HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-04-10HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-04-10SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2017-04-10SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-04-03SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 7
2017-03-14HouseAmended
2017-03-14HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author)
2017-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-08HouseCR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632101New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback