OK HB1549 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1549
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Prenatal Nondiscrimination Act of 2017; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Prenatal Nondiscrimination Act of 2017; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. George Faught [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Travis Dunlap [R] |
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 16 |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John), Dunlap |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1549 (Carry Over) 2017-04-04 - Second Reading referred to Rules