OK HB1549 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - coauthored by Perryman
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - coauthored by Perryman
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wind energy; modifying the Oklahoma Wind Energy Development Act; effective date.
Title
Wind energy; modifying the Oklahoma Wind Energy Development Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] |
Rep. David Perryman [D] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | coauthored by Perryman |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 9 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Quinn, Mazzei |
2015-03-11 | House | Remove Senator Quinn as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Bingman |
2015-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2015-02-04 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Sears |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 160 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 160 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |