OK HB1519 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; address information; real property records; forms; procedures; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; address information; real property records; forms; procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Wyrick (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Loring |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |