OK HB1505 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1505
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; delivery and storage of electronic documents; permitting insurers to post certain policies or endorsements; effective date.
Title
Insurance; delivery and storage of electronic documents; permitting insurers to post certain policies or endorsements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Approved by Governor 04/16/2024 |
2024-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2024-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Sneed |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1505 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules