OK HB1501 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1501
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish; decreasing the frequency of required Wildlife Conservation Commission regular session meetings; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; decreasing the frequency of required Wildlife Conservation Commission regular session meetings; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Approved by Governor 04/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-22 | House | Amended |
2017-02-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1501 (Carry Over) 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017