OK HB1495 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1495
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Death Certificate Accuracy Act; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Death Certificate Accuracy Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Travis Dunlap [R] | Rep. Kevin Calvey [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Chuck Strohm [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-03-09 | Senate | coauthored by Strohm |
2017-03-07 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 26 |
2017-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Calvey, Faught, McDugle |
2017-03-06 | House | Considered |
2017-02-27 | House | Laid over |
2017-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2017-02-27 | House | General Order |
2017-02-08 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2017-02-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Dunlap |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1495 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 316b | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 317 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 317b | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 324 | New Code | See Bill Text |