OK HB1483 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1483
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; county jail reimbursement rate; establishing notification procedure when incarceration costs exceed minimum reimbursement rate; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; county jail reimbursement rate; establishing notification procedure when incarceration costs exceed minimum reimbursement rate; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] | Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Rep. John Enns [R] |
Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] |
Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] |
Rep. John Jordan [R] | Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] | Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] |
Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Rep. Matt Meredith [D] |
Rep. Josh West [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-08 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 9 |
2017-05-08 | House | Remove Representative Osborn (Leslie) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Biggs |
2017-05-08 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Biggs |
2017-05-08 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs, Cockroft, Coody, Casey, Kerbs, Frix, Enns, West (Josh), Pfeiffer, Cannaday, Tadlock, Sanders, Meredith, Caldwell, Jordan, Baker, Roberts (Dustin), Humphrey |
2017-03-22 | House | Remove Representative Biggs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Osborn (Leslie) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCall, Bennett (John) |
2017-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1483 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017