OK HB1481 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; modifying emergency response responsibility of the Department of Environmental Quality; clarifying certain hazardous waste duty; effective date.
Title
Environment and natural resources; modifying emergency response responsibility of the Department of Environmental Quality; clarifying certain hazardous waste duty; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2011-03-15 | General Order | |
2011-03-02 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-02 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Armes | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 4 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 4 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |