OK HB1459 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1459
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; Lindsey Nicole Henry Scholarships for Students with Disabilities Program; modifying purpose of program; students in out-of-home placements or adopted while in DHS custody; emergency.
Title
Schools; Lindsey Nicole Henry Scholarships for Students with Disabilities Program; modifying purpose of program; students in out-of-home placements or adopted while in DHS custody; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Rep. Tim Downing [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's received |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Emergency added |
2017-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hall, Downing |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1459 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - CCR submitted