OK HB1458 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1458
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; burn bans; declaring extreme fire danger; emergency.
Title
Agriculture; burn bans; declaring extreme fire danger; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs |
2023-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 11 |
2023-03-01 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-01 | House | Amended |
2023-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval |
2023-03-01 | House | General Order |
2023-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Patzkowsky |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1458 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken