OK HB1448 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1448
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; powers of the Board of Chiropractic Examiners; requiring certain applicants to submit to national criminal history record check; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; powers of the Board of Chiropractic Examiners; requiring certain applicants to submit to national criminal history record check; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | Remove Representative Roberts (Dustin) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Faught |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1448 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 161 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 567 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |