OK HB1446 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Immigration; relating to unlawful transport of an alien; making the smuggling of human beings unlawful; providing penalties; codification; effective date.
Title
Immigration; relating to unlawful transport of an alien; making the smuggling of human beings unlawful; providing penalties; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Charles Key [R] |
Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: R (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: R (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Laid over | |
2011-05-17 | CCR failed of adoption | |
2011-05-16 | Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Shortey | |
2011-05-16 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Christian | |
2011-05-16 | Enacting clause restored | |
2011-05-16 | Title restored | |
2011-05-16 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-09 | Conference granted, SCs named Justice, Sykes, Newberry, Brinkley, Allen, Fields, Ballenger, Ellis, Garrison | |
2011-05-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-05-02 | SA's received | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 | |
2011-04-27 | coauthored by Christian, Key | |
2011-04-27 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-28 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2011-03-28 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-24 | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee | |
2011-03-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7 | |
2011-03-10 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-10 | Amended | |
2011-03-10 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn, Cockroft | |
2011-03-10 | General Order | |
2011-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Faught | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 171 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3242 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3311 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |