OK HB1445 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1445
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring school district to post information about issuing bonds prior to an election on its website; effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring school district to post information about issuing bonds prior to an election on its website; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 05/02/2023 |
2023-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-27 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Deck |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Provenzano |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1445 (Carry Over) 2023-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2023