OK HB1439 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1439
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset; State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; re-creating Board; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; re-creating Board; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. Jason Smalley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2019 |
2019-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-05-09 | House | SAs considered |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid over |
2019-05-08 | House | SA's considered |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Dahm |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Smalley |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1439 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019