OK HB1435 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sunset; Oklahoma State Athletic Commission; re-creating Commission; modifying termination date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset; Oklahoma State Athletic Commission; re-creating Commission; modifying termination date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-14SenateCCR read
2019-05-14HouseTo Senate
2019-05-14HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
2019-05-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
2019-05-14HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-08HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Smalley, McCortney, Coleman, Rosino, Hicks, Young
2019-04-23HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Administrative Rules
2019-04-17HouseSA's received
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-11SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Dahm
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-04-02SenateWithdrawn from General Government committee
2019-03-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2019-03-27SenateRemove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Smalley
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2019-03-12SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-12HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Administrative Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Gann
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1435&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1435%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1435%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1435%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1435%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1435%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1435%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1435%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1435_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1435_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback