OK HB1422 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State capital and capitol building; repealing the Oklahoma Centennial County Courthouses Preservation Act; effective date.
Title
State capital and capitol building; repealing the Oklahoma Centennial County Courthouses Preservation Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Murphey |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 99 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 99 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 99 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 99 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 99 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 99 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |