OK HB1419 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Brecheen
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Brecheen
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State capital and capitol building; repealing the Oklahoma Centennial Act; effective date.
Title
State capital and capitol building; repealing the Oklahoma Centennial Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Brecheen |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Murphey |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 98 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 98 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 98 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 98 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 98 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 98 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 98 | 7 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |