OK HB1405 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Returned by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Returned by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; establishing total annual fee for disposal of drinking water treatment residuals in certain injection wells.
Title
Environment and natural resources; establishing total annual fee for disposal of drinking water treatment residuals in certain injection wells.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Returned by Governor |
2015-04-21 | House | Recalled from Governor by HCR 1007 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 3 |
2015-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |