OK HB1404 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1404
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Local government funding options; taxation of rock, gravel, granite, sand and limestone; effective date.
Title
Local government funding options; taxation of rock, gravel, granite, sand and limestone; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 25 |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1404 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Finance