OK HB1387 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; theft of domestic animals; modifying certain penalty; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; theft of domestic animals; modifying certain penalty; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 19 |
2015-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pfeiffer, Biggs |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Enns |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Murdock |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |