OK HB1364 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Career and work-readiness; directing Department of Commerce to review and approve career-readiness assessments and credentials; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career and work-readiness; directing Department of Commerce to review and approve career-readiness assessments and credentials; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseApproved by Governor 05/20/2019
2019-05-15HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-15SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-15HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-14HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-14HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 20; Ayes: 68 Nays: 17
2019-05-14HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11
2019-04-24SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-04-24SenateTitle restored
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2019-04-10SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-10SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-02SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-02SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Nollan
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-21HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2019-02-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McBride, Fetgatter
2019-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-02-18HouseReferred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-18HouseWithdrawn from Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Hasenbeck
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1364&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1364%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1364%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1364%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1364%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1364%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1364%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1364%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1364_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1364_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback