OK HB1350 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Grand River Dam Authority; allowing the Grand River Dam Authority to sell electrical system equipment to customers. Emergency.
Title
Grand River Dam Authority; allowing the Grand River Dam Authority to sell electrical system equipment to customers. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 44 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Utility and Environment Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Utility and Environment Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Emergency added |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 32; Ayes: 44 Nays: 43 |
2013-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer |
2013-03-06 | House | General Order |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Utility and Environmental Regulation |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Cox |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |