OK HB1338 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1338
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; allowing certain inmates to request medical parole review; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; allowing certain inmates to request medical parole review; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Babinec [R] | Sen. Tom Dugger [R] | Rep. Emily Virgin [D] | Rep. Forrest Bennett [D] |
Rep. Jason Lowe [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 15 |
2017-05-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lowe, Virgin |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 5 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-20 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett (Forrest) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16 |
2017-03-14 | House | Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Dugger (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-16 | House | Remove Representative Cleveland as principal House author and substitute with Representative Babinec |
2017-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Cleveland |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1338 (Carry Over) 2017-05-23 - CCR read