OK HB1332 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1332
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Alarm, Locksmith and Fire Sprinkler Industry Committee; modifying powers and duties of the Committee; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Alarm, Locksmith and Fire Sprinkler Industry Committee; modifying powers and duties of the Committee; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Judd Strom [R] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 04/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Floyd (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-09 | House | General Order |
2023-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Strom |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1332 (Carry Over) 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2023