OK HB1330 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; directing the State Board of Education to adopt rules requiring waiver of certain curriculum requirement for certain military students; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; directing the State Board of Education to adopt rules requiring waiver of certain curriculum requirement for certain military students; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Sen. Jack Fry [R] | Rep. Scott Inman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Approved by Governor 04/10/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2015-02-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Inman |
2015-02-12 | House | General Order |
2015-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Fry (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Coody (Ann) |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |