OK HB1327 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; Oklahoma Forestry Code; prescribed burning; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; Oklahoma Forestry Code; prescribed burning; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Approved by Governor 04/20/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-14 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-13 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-06 | coauthored by Walker | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Authored by Senator Lerblance (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | Removed from Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Pruett | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |