OK HB1320 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1320
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; exempting certain veterans from payment of tuition to institutions of higher education; codification; effective date.
Title
Schools; exempting certain veterans from payment of tuition to institutions of higher education; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Albright |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1320 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee