OK HB1320 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; changing provision to age at time of placement instead of age at time of filing; effective date.
Title
Children; changing provision to age at time of placement instead of age at time of filing; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jordan |
2015-02-12 | House | General Order |
2015-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth, and Family Services |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |