OK HB1312 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1312
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tax credit; daycare of deployed servicemember; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax credit; daycare of deployed servicemember; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Collin Walke [D] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Rep. Josh West [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, West (Josh) |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Walke |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1312 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations