OK HB1311 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Endangered species; creating the Endangered Species and Economic Development Task Force; noncodification; emergency.
Title
Endangered species; creating the Endangered Species and Economic Development Task Force; noncodification; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 12 | |
2011-03-10 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Richardson | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |