OK HB1304 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal procedure; defining term; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; defining term; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2013-03-06 | House | General Order |
2013-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hoskin |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |