OK HB1304 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Technology; creating the Information Technology Consolidation and Coordination Act.
Title
Technology; creating the Information Technology Consolidation and Coordination Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-18 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-17 | To Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 31; Ayes: 57 Nays: 34 | |
2011-05-17 | Ayes: 63 Nays: 29 | |
2011-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | Emergency added | |
2011-05-16 | Title restored | |
2011-05-16 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-03 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2011-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2011-04-27 | SA's received | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 18 | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Motion expired | |
2011-03-16 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby | |
2011-03-16 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 50 Nays: 39 | |
2011-03-16 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 45 | |
2011-03-16 | Amended | |
2011-03-16 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Brinkley | |
2011-03-16 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-16 | General Order | |
2011-02-28 | Emergency added | |
2011-02-28 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Derby | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 508 | 2c | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 35 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |