OK HB1299 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1299
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; zero emission facility tax credits; electric power reports; procedures; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; zero emission facility tax credits; electric power reports; procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Calvey |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Sears |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1299 (Carry Over) 2017-03-02 - Title stricken