OK HB1276 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage; child custody; requiring equally shared parenting time if requested by a parent; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage; child custody; requiring equally shared parenting time if requested by a parent; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 7
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh)
2019-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Lawson
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback