OK HB1270 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1270

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor 03/16/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Welfare; creating the Act to Restore Hope, Opportunity and Prosperity for Everyone or the HOPE Act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Welfare; creating the Act to Restore Hope, Opportunity and Prosperity for Everyone or the HOPE Act; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: ADOPT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseApproved by Governor 03/16/2018
2018-03-15HouseSent to Governor
2018-03-15SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-03-14HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2018-03-14HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative ODonnell
2018-03-14HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 32
2018-03-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Mulready
2018-03-14HouseRemove Representative Hall as principal House author and substitute with Representative ODonnell
2018-03-14HouseAyes: 60 Nays: 26
2018-03-14HouseSA's read, adopted
2017-04-27HouseSA's received
2017-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
2017-04-26SenateTitle restored
2017-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-04-12SenateTitle stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-04-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-04-10SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-04-10SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-27HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-23HouseMotion expired
2017-03-22HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hall
2017-03-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 25
2017-03-22HouseAmended
2017-03-22HouseConsidered
2017-03-22HouseLaid over
2017-03-22HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-03-22HouseTitle stricken
2017-03-22HouseAmended
2017-03-22HouseAuthored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
2017-03-22HouseGeneral Order
2017-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Hall
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1270 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - SA's received

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1270&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1270%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1270%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1270%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1270%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1270%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1270%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1270%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB1270%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1270_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1270_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1270_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback