OK HB1260 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-17)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-17)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/01/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Rural Economic Action Plan Fund; making an appropriation. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Rural Economic Action Plan Fund; making an appropriation. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Auffet [D] | Rep. Dennis Bailey [D] | Sen. Roger Ballenger [D] | Sen. Don Barrington [R] |
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Neil Brannon [D] | Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Mike Brown [D] |
Rep. Samson Buck [D] | Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Sen. Kenneth Corn [D] | Rep. Dale DeWitt [R] |
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Jerry Ellis [D] | Sen. John Ford [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] |
Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Rep. Wes Hilliard [D] |
Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Sen. Todd Lamb [R] |
Sen. Richard Lerblance [D] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] |
Sen. Judy McIntyre [D] | Rep. Ken Miller [R] | Rep. Danny Morgan [D] | Sen. David Myers [R] |
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Sen. Susan Paddack [D] | Rep. Brian Renegar [D] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Sen. Steve Russell [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D] |
Rep. Glen Smithson [D] | Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Cory Williams [D] | Sen. Jim Wilson [D] |
Sen. Charles Wyrick [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-22 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-02-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-02-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by Governor 06/01/2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-26 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-26 | coauthored by Ballenger, Burrage, Corn, Garrison, Paddack, Ellis, Sparks, Marlatt, Lamb, Lerblance, Ivester, Eason McIntyre, Gumm, Wilson, Schulz, Halligan, Brown, Barrington, Bingman, Justice, Ford, Newberry, Wyrick, Russell | |
2009-05-26 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-22 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-22 | To Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 2 | |
2009-05-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) DeWitt, Roan, Buck, Williams, Luttrell, Shoemake, Bailey, Renegar, Smithson, Brannon, Hilliard, Brown, Morgan, Auffet, Sherrer, Dorman, Hickman | |
2009-05-22 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-22 | Laid over | |
2009-05-22 | Considered | |
2009-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-21 | Title restored | |
2009-05-21 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2009-04-22 | SA's received | |
2009-04-22 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-21 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-21 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-21 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-03-23 | Direct to Calendar | |
2009-02-09 | First Reading | |
2009-02-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | |
2009-02-05 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-05 | Amended | |
2009-02-05 | General Order | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2009-02-02 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |