OK HB1259 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; allowing disclosure of certain ballots by specific means; digital photo; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; allowing disclosure of certain ballots by specific means; digital photo; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 6 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-23HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-23SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-23HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure sent to House
2019-05-22SenateMotion expired
2019-05-22SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Smalley
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 22
2019-05-22SenateAyes: 28 Nays: 19
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-20SenateCCR read
2019-05-20HouseTo Senate
2019-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 4
2019-05-20HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-16HouseTitle restored
2019-05-16HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Paxton, McCortney, Jech, Daniels, Kirt, Ikley-Freeman
2019-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5
2019-04-24SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-09SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-19SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-18HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-18HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5
2019-02-18HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-12HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Montgomery
2019-02-12HouseAuthored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
2019-02-12HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Hilbert
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1259&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1259%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1259%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1259%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1259%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1259%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1259%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1259%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1259%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1259_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1259_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback