OK HB1259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1259
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; allowing disclosure of certain ballots by specific means; digital photo; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; effective date.
Title
Elections; allowing disclosure of certain ballots by specific means; digital photo; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 6 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 6 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Measure sent to House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Motion expired |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Smalley |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 22 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Ayes: 28 Nays: 19 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2019-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 4 |
2019-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2019-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2019-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, McCortney, Jech, Daniels, Kirt, Ikley-Freeman |
2019-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5 |
2019-02-18 | House | General Order |
2019-02-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Montgomery |
2019-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1259 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019