OK HB1249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1249
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; apportionments; modifying destination fund for certain apportionments; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; apportionments; modifying destination fund for certain apportionments; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | Senate | coauthored by Brumbaugh |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | General Order |
2017-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Sanders |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1249 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 500 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 500 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 707 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |