CA SB900 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 288, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4775, 5550, and 5610 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Common interest developments: repair and maintenance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB900 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 900 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Valencia (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB900 Umberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 288, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-04 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2024-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5603.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2024-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2024-08-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6501.) Ordered to the Senate.
2024-08-20AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-20AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2024-08-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2024-06-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-06-26AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2024-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-06-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2024-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
2024-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4018.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-06SenateOrdered to second reading.
2024-05-06SenateRead third time and amended.
2024-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3819.) (April 30).
2024-04-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2024-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3445.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-03-06SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD.
2024-02-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2024-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2024-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2024-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code4775Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code5550Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code5610Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#92AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#91ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900#90CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB900

Bill Comments

feedback