OK HB1240 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Firearms; directing court clerks to forward commitment orders to certain entities; effective date.
Title
Firearms; directing court clerks to forward commitment orders to certain entities; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Martin [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2013-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2013-03-14 | House | Amended |
2013-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-14 | House | General Order |
2013-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Martin (Steve) |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1290 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 415 | New Code | See Bill Text |